VENTNOR CRICKET CLUB LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for boys, girls, men and women to practice and play competitive and friendly cricket. Maintenance and upkeep of a cricket ground to a high standard with good pitches and a smooth outfield. Maintenance and organisation of an indoor cricket school for practice and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 12 May 2011: Standard registration
- 27 February 2012: Funds received from 1093352 VENTNOR CRICKET CLUB
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Benson | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Neil Fletcher | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
RONALD BERNARD COOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.22k | £35.19k | £52.64k | £73.93k | £56.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.23k | £50.64k | £66.08k | £82.36k | £98.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.05k | £17.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 September 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 09 September 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2019
(These accounts |
30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON24/01/2011 16/06/2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ISLE OF WIGHT, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET.
Area of benefit
ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
PIPPINS
GULLY ROAD
SEAVIEW
PO34 5BY
- Phone:
- 01983613651
- Email:
- RONCOOK99@BTINTERNET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window