Financial history MOONDANCE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £34.23m £37.53m £39.98m £43.51m £77.33m
Total expenditure £10.21m £10.81m £11.71m £15.90m £18.19m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £22.15m £22.78m £24.79m £27.09m £47.70m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.08m £14.75m £15.19m £16.42m £29.63m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.21m £10.81m £11.71m £15.90m £18.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £31.90k £3.90k £3.90k £3.90k £3.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.18m £10.75m £0 £15.84m £18.12m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0