Accounts and annual returns LIFE CHANGE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1140521
Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 July 2020 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required