Financial history LIFE CHANGE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1140521
Charity reporting is overdue by 64 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.15k £1.16k £731 £774 £323
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A