SOUTHAMPTON CHINESE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1141228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £32.21k £232.07k £34.57k £26.03k £26.39k
Total expenditure £9.50k £11.63k £17.30k £18.62k £4.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A