ROTARY INTERNATIONAL DISTRICT 1040 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of the poor and needy anywhere in the world. Current activities are focused on helping 1. the community of Ukerewe, an island near Mwanza, Tanzania. 2. people suffering from Motor Neurone Disease; 3. victims of the earthquakes in Nepal. 4. Ukraine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- City Of York
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
- Nepal
- Slovakia
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Ukraine
Governance
- 08 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Elizabeth Sutcliffe | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Rogers | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Greenwood | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Tagg | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|||||
DAVID ARTHUR ROBINSON | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES ELLIS | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.95k | £5.07k | £155.53k | £15.41k | £9.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.80k | £10.99k | £117.17k | £49.64k | £6.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maidens Folly
Youlton
Tollerton
YORK
YO61 1QL
- Phone:
- 01347838006
- Email:
- d.robinson436@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window