FRIENDS OF EAST HUNSBURY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1139230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SCHOOL DISCO'S, CHRISTMAS FAYRE, SPONSORED EVENTS, SUMMER FETE, UNIFORM SHOP, PAMPER NIGHT, CAR BOOT SALES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £16,416
Total expenditure: £14,619

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FEHPS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Inderjit Jutla Chair 10 October 2018
None on record
Fiona Landeman Trustee 08 February 2023
None on record
Katherine Ann Macey Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.79k £2.32k £3.31k £10.48k £16.42k
Total expenditure £3.74k £987 £818 £6.40k £14.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.13k £6.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 Tiffany Gardens
NORTHAMPTON
NN4 0TJ
Phone:
01604677970
Website:

No information available