Trustees CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND

Charity number: 1140097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Most Revd Justin Welby Chair 04 February 2013
THE ARCHBISHOPS' COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND
Received: On time
POOR VICAR'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Dame Kate Barker Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Christopher Hancock Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Jenny Buck Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
The Rt Revd Stephen David Lake Trustee 19 October 2022
SARUM ST MICHAEL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
SOWTER CLERICAL LIBRARY
Received: On time
Remi Olu-Pitan Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
The Very Revd Rogers Govender Trustee 01 May 2022
MANCHESTER MEMORIAL CHARITY
Recently registered
VOLITION COMMUNITY
Received: 123 days late
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
MANCHESTER COUNCIL FOR COMMUNITY RELATIONS
Received: On time
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
CANON RICHSON'S EXHIBITION FUND
Received: On time
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL CHOIR SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MILLENNIUM QUARTER TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE BENNETT STREET EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Overdue by 393 days
Revd Canon Flora Winfield Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Rt Revd Graham Usher Trustee 01 December 2021
THE NORWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
Nigel TIMMINS Trustee 03 April 2021
None on record
Busola Sodeinde Trustee 01 January 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WITH SAINT PAUL ONSLOW SQUARE AND SAINT AUGUSTINE SOUTH KENSINGTON
Received: On time
MOST REVD AND RT HON STEPHEN GEOFFREY COTTRELL Trustee 09 July 2020
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ARCHBISHOPS' COUNCIL
Received: On time
Helen Steers Trustee 27 February 2020
None on record
Andrew Selous MP Trustee 10 January 2020
None on record
Jay Greene Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Rt Revd Vivienne Faull Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Rev Anne Stevens Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Very Revd Mark Bonney Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Canon Elizabeth Renshaw MBE Trustee 01 January 2019
CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL SERVICES
Received: On time
ROSALIND MORAG ELLIS QC Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Alan Smith Trustee 08 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH ROXETH (HARROW)
Received: On time
ORLEY FARM SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Rev CHRISTOPHER SMITH Trustee 27 July 2017
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT ALBAN THE MARTYR, HOLBORN WITH SAINT PETER, SAFFRON HILL
Received: On time
STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ST URSULA'S HOME
Received: On time
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SUZANNE AVERY Trustee 28 February 2017
THE PENNY TRUST
Received: On time
BISHOP OF MANCHESTER Trustee 01 January 2014
THE CLINK CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Stephen Trott Trustee 01 January 1999
RICHARD HUMFREY CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHARD HUMFREY (EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE INDEPENDENT GRAMMAR SCHOOL CHARITY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
CANON PETER BRUINVELS Trustee
THE GUILDFORD DIOCESE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
JACOB PETER VINCE Trustee
None on record