Trustees MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1139257
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephanie Claire Wright | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen O'Keane | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James Keveth | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Murray | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Silver | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir Paul James Curran | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bayan Ata Jaswantry Mohajeri Thaker | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shewly Khanam Choudhury | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Polly Charlotta Hannah Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emily Revess | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SCHOL | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.