Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL DEBATE EDUCATION ASSOCIATION-UK

Charity number: 1139452
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time