MANCHESTER CITY F.C. CITY IN THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 May 2017 On time Download