Financial history MANCHESTER CITY F.C. CITY IN THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.69m £3.02m £3.11m £3.15m £3.39m
Total expenditure £2.69m £2.96m £3.03m £3.10m £2.90m
Income from government contracts £253.11k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £411.50k £301.72k £326.32k £46.38k £641.04k
Income - Donations and legacies £739.84k £672.15k £684.87k £743.31k £797.32k
Income - Other trading activities £98.55k £144.92k £107.99k £40.49k £124.23k
Income - Charitable activities £1.84m £2.19m £2.28m £2.36m £2.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £1.11k £0
Income - Other £12.68k £14.06k £44.59k £5.78k £3.40k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.93m £2.19m £2.35m £2.20m £2.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £744.46k £764.48k £671.02k £907.66k £720.15k
Expenditure - Governance £15.18k £14.78k £15.24k £22.32k £24.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £58.41k £64.34k £19.49k £1.25k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £21.11k £5.71k £3.04k £42 £0