Trustees MANCHESTER CITY F.C. CITY IN THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1139229

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK JOSEPH DOMINIC LOFTUS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chinedum Onuoha | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN BARRY PARKER | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON RICHARD CLIFF | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DANNY WILSON | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Nissim Pitchon | Trustee | 03 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARA MARIA TODD | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT KEVIN BALLANTINE | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.