Accounts and annual returns ARK COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LTD

Charity number: 1140576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 12 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 12 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 31 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 31 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 31 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 31 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window