Financial history ARK COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LTD

Charity number: 1140576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £457.63k £330.80k £377.36k £409.84k £601.16k
Total expenditure £444.04k £326.77k £384.72k £412.18k £586.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £330.77k £377.30k £409.69k £600.46k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £479
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £600.46k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £47
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £656
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £586.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0