MANCHESTER TURKISH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1143097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.22k £32.96k £55.92k £93.12k £93.50k
Total expenditure £28.93k £44.64k £52.34k £92.74k £93.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A