OXFORD BROOKES STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1140275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Erika Allaissem Toguy Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Katie Starns Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Maxwell Stewart Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Daisy Hopkins Chair 01 July 2019 None on record
Thomas Charles Andrew Smith Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record
Sean Keeley Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Maya Garvis Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Professor Anne Marie Kilday Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Adrian Donald White Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Niamh Walter Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Tafadzwa Iman Tadu Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record