WALK-IN-SPACE

Charity number: 1142954
Charity reporting is overdue by 418 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £9.77k £10.00k £0 £1.50k £0
Total expenditure £11.54k £9.02k £7.93k £4.93k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A