ST MARY'S MILL BANK PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1141418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 January 2020 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required