INSTITUTE OF WELFARE

Charity number: 1144623
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 November 2017 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required