Financial history HOMESCHOOL SOCIAL ENTERPRISE

Charity number: 1146794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £12.55k £12.21k £21.07k £18.30k £15.22k
Total expenditure £11.46k £11.62k £21.00k £17.61k £15.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A