PEDESTRIAN LIMITED

Charity number: 1140032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 14 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 01 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 09 July 2019 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 09 July 2019 39 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 25 June 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 25 June 2018 25 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 13 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 13 March 2017 On time Download