AGE UK SELBY DISTRICT

Charity number: 1139928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 November 2016 On time Download