AGE UK SELBY DISTRICT

Charity number: 1139928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £279.15k £350.09k £304.48k £301.40k £238.77k
Total expenditure £256.03k £284.64k £304.71k £299.03k £293.53k
Income from government contracts £61.10k £77.16k £67.79k £69.76k £48.80k
Income from government grants £12.75k £96.22k £59.74k £47.68k £48.80k