Trustees FULHAM PALACE TRUST
Charity number: 1140088

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Martin Gray | Chair | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Benjamin Jackson | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fenella Goodhart | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Bradley Coben | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew George Pottage | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Graeme Cassidy | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Farley-Persaud | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robbie Sommerville | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona McWilliams | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Penny Seabrook | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARIANA SPATER | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Sawrey King | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Quinlan | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.