Financial history ALL HANDS AND HEARTS ( UK ) TRUST

Charity number: 1139938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £220.14k £132.45k £206.11k £73.41k £4.52k
Total expenditure £266.21k £91.51k £166.04k £50.29k £35.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A