Financial history ART AGAINST KNIVES

Charity number: 1140866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £247.38k £253.87k £373.89k £606.80k £650.17k
Total expenditure £200.42k £247.13k £288.03k £468.11k £506.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £84.02k
Income from government grants £20.00k £0 £151.68k £228.44k £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £82.30k £226.53k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £524.50k £423.64k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £433.27k £462.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £34.84k £44.08k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £11.07k £21.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0