ST. MATTHEW'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1140964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 September 2020 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 September 2020 92 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 July 2019 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 July 2019 26 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 17 March 2017 On time Download