ST. MATTHEW'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1140964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £140.32k £80.87k £132.99k £148.50k £210.54k
Total expenditure £99.66k £110.90k £101.12k £142.36k £176.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.69k £16.32k £65.57k £22.47k £94.43k