ST. MATTHEW'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1140964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenny Greenfield Trustee 22 October 2015 None on record
Daisy Streatfield Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Ryan Chishick Trustee 11 December 2013 None on record
David Keen Trustee 29 June 2015 None on record
Lekan Ojumu Trustee 26 October 2016 None on record
JAMES ALEXANDER Trustee None on record