CARLISLE VILLA AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carlisle Villa ABC provides boxing and fitness activities to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 18 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Graves | Chair | 20 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BRENNAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.16k | £23.50k | £43.11k | £59.58k | £65.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.33k | £10.04k | £9.71k | £26.47k | £42.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR COACHING AND TRAINING IN THE SPORT OF BOXING AND TO OFFER COMPETITIVE OPPORTUNITIES IN BOXING.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 QUEBEC AVENUE
CARLISLE
CA2 4EA
- Phone:
- 07752703379
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window