Accounts and annual returns THE VINE HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 501524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 17 March 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 13 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 13 February 2020 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 21 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required