REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD- REHOBOTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HAVE MOVED VENUE TO ENFIELD RANGERS YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB, CARTERHATCH LANE, EN1 4LJ, ENFIELD, LONDON.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
Governance
- 10 March 2011: Standard registration
- RCCG- REHOBOTH CENTRE (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR PHILLIP SEGUN OYETUNJI | Chair | 05 January 2021 |
|
|||||
KAYODE JOSHUA OLUYEDE | Trustee | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
OLUSEYE PEKUN FATIMILEHIN | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.26k | £70.46k | £73.52k | £58.09k | £58.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.92k | £72.39k | £125.40k | £77.96k | £63.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 DECEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Enfield Rangers YFC
Off Carterhatch Lane
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN1 4LJ
- Phone:
- 07908430649
- Email:
- EJBLRCCG@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window