Financial history MUALLIM ACADEMY

Charity number: 1142455
Charity reporting is up to date (104 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £38.12k £33.46k £25.63k £42.77k £21.74k
Total expenditure £34.35k £34.69k £31.42k £28.87k £20.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £15.86k