FARNBOROUGH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1143212
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.90k £15.56k £16.41k £9.89k £22.04k
Total expenditure £13.80k £14.79k £12.62k £15.42k £14.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.00k N/A N/A N/A