OXFORD CITY FARM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the provision of educational and social opportunities related to food farming and caring for the wider environment. The charity seeks to create and maintain a life-long learning environment where both able and differently abled individuals, based either locally or further afield, can advance their knowledge, skills and psychological well-being through farm and farm-associated activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
214 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 October 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Wilson | Chair | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Robert Halder | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mariam Iqbal | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Elizabeth Ader | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chesta Tiwari | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Rosie Dent | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Fisher | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine McCosker | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Reed | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.33k | £144.71k | £150.44k | £200.31k | £249.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.26k | £78.85k | £121.01k | £203.79k | £238.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.60k | £14.54k | £5.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/09/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, INCLUDING CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED PEOPLE, ELDERLY PEOPLE, DISABLED PEOPLE AND OTHERWISE DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, CRAFTS, ANIMAL HUSBANDRY, COUNTRY LIFE, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT THROUGH BEST ENVIRONMENTAL PRACTICES. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST PERSONS REGARDLESS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN ENTERPRISES RELATING TO AGRICULTURE, FARMING, HORTICULTURE AND ANY OTHER SUCH PROJECTS WITH THE INTENT OF TRAINING SUCH PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH OPPORTUNITIES, INCLUDING VOLUNTEERING AND WORK EXPERIENCE IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THEIR KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND ABILITIES AND THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE MY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oxford City Farm
Cornwallis Road
OXFORD
OX4 3NH
- Phone:
- 01865777571
- Email:
- info@oxfordcityfarm.org.uk
- Website:
-
oxfordcityfarm.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window