Financial history THE HENRY JACKSON SOCIETY

Charity number: 1140489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.31m £1.29m £1.42m £1.48m £794.18k
Total expenditure £1.13m £1.34m £1.56m £1.21m £1.01m
Income from government contracts £10.43k £20.86k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.17m £1.24m £1.36m £1.46m £781.29k
Income - Other trading activities £139.81k £46.37k £51.38k £12.08k £12.17k
Income - Charitable activities £2.82k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £124 £33 £7 £14 £13
Income - Other £770 £3.71k £3.82k £5.60k £713
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.34m £1.56m £1.21m £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £1.58k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.71k £0 £28.92k £14.56k £8.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0