Financial history JAPANESE GARDEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1141251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.06k £38.10k £26.78k £24.82k £24.82k
Total expenditure £13.34k £31.33k £35.68k £27.52k £27.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A