THE STUFF YOUR RUCKSACK TRUST

Charity number: 1142953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/12/2016 06/12/2017 06/12/2018 06/12/2019 06/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A