ANJUMA RAZA-E-MUSTAFA TRUST

Charity number: 1140777
Charity reporting is up to date (309 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 September 2021 309 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 August 2020 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 September 2021 675 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 February 2020 467 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1092 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 11 October 2017 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 October 2017 345 days late Download