Accounts and annual returns ALL EARS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1142782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required