Financial history ALL EARS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1142782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £20.14k £7.52k £7 £2.00k £74
Total expenditure £4.49k £8.87k £2.24k £127 £75
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A