Financial history DURHAM ACTION ON SINGLE HOUSING LTD

Charity number: 501556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £746.44k £700.44k £692.36k £702.58k £704.53k
Total expenditure £708.34k £599.92k £601.74k £634.05k £610.59k
Income from government contracts £256.46k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.45k £311.14k £329.17k £330.02k £330.68k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.56k £4.29k £20.20k £22.50k £35.39k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £742.75k £694.82k £669.82k £675.22k £663.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.13k £1.34k £2.34k £4.86k £5.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £708.34k £599.92k £601.74k £634.05k £610.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.57k £1.62k £1.67k £1.72k £4.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0