Accounts and annual returns MOJA PAMOJA

Charity number: 1140701
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 21 days
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 21 days
Annual return 30 July 2022 27 June 2023 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2021 31 May 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2020 23 July 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2019 23 July 2021 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 Not Required