Financial history GLYNCOCH COMMUNITY REGENERATION LTD

Charity number: 1142855
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £256.91k £166.89k £170.75k £148.01k £145.27k
Total expenditure £322.22k £217.92k £211.26k £207.99k £209.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £211.90k £145.82k £127.99k N/A £119.71k