BUILDING TRUST INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1142338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £96.77k £16.56k £21.04k £425 £45.79k
Total expenditure £96.48k £23.27k £14.09k £2.29k £37.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A