SHEFFIELD HALLAM UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1141925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 15 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 10 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 14 March 2017 On time Download