Financial history SHEFFIELD HALLAM UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1141925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £3.21m £3.21m £2.96m £2.73m £2.81m
Total expenditure £3.16m £3.14m £3.44m £2.39m £2.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £132.84k £126.14k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.47m £2.47m £2.47m £2.49m £2.47m
Income - Other trading activities £36.54k £36.56k £52.47k £17.28k £47.56k
Income - Charitable activities £678.75k £666.96k £408.28k £87.67k £243.74k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £228 £4.97k £9.04k £4.21k £6.56k
Income - Other £27.21k £22.95k £18.88k £125.77k £44.16k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.09m £3.08m £2.75m £2.33m £2.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £67.43k £64.74k £70.68k £67.16k £132.85k
Expenditure - Governance £65.69k £68.33k £71.71k £87.85k £130.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £624.61k £0 £0