Trustees SHEFFIELD HALLAM UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1141925

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Breen | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Uju Vanessa Okoroafor | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mobolaji Edun | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Misbah Hasham Ticklay | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Omolara Afolabi | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alfiya Khan | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashley McDowell | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Davies | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leah Booker | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Erdlenbruch | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dayo Oladiti | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sergiou-Fawcett | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sabahat Pathan | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.