POITIERS CARE

Charity number: 1141270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 28 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 12 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required